Yazzie v. Reservation Asset Recovery LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Yazzie
Defendant: Reservation Asset Recovery LLC, Aaron Look, Irene Buchholz, Steve Hoover, Jennifer Hoover and Ricardo Rocha
Case Number: 2:2021cv01951
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aaron Look. (WLP)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Eric Yazzie against Aaron Look. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason)
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Reservation Asset Recovery LLC. (SST)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Eric Yazzie against Reservation Asset Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Barrat, Jason)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Notice of Service Pursuant to Dkt 5 by Eric Yazzie re: #5 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Barrat, Jason)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Eric Yazzie: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDEROF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS. upon Aaron Look on 21.12.15. (Barrat, Jason)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Eric Yazzie: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS. upon Reservation Asset Recovery, LLC on 21.11.30. (Barrat, Jason)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Eric Yazzie. Party Steve Hoover (an Arizona resident), Ricardo Rocha (an Arizona resident), Irene Buchholz (an Arizona resident) and Jennifer Hoover (an Arizona resident) terminated. (Barrat, Jason)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/17/2021. (RMV)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Irene Buchholz, Jennifer Hoover, Steve Hoover, Aaron Look, Reservation Asset Recovery LLC, Ricardo Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20076413. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1951-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Eric Yazzie. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MCO)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20076413 filed by Eric Yazzie.. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazzie v. Reservation Asset Recovery LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Yazzie
Represented By: Jason Saul Barrat
Represented By: Michael David Zoldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reservation Asset Recovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Look
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?