Griffith v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Renee N Griffith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01962
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Talbert appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Talbert, Daniel)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Renee N Griffith: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons and Complaint upon Commissioner, Social Security Administration on 11/26/2021, 1US Attorney on 1/24/2021, and US Attorney General on 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service upon Attorney General, #2 Exhibit Service upon U.S. Attorney, #3 Exhibit Service upon Office of General Counsel) (Schiffman, Anna) *Modified text on 12/15/2021 (DXD).
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See attached Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/22/2021. (JAMA)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on February 22, 2022. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/22/2021. (JAMA)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Glenn McCormick Acting U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20083320. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1962-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Renee N Griffith. (Schiffman, Anna) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20083320 filed by Renee N Griffith. (Schiffman, Anna) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee N Griffith
Represented By: Anna Tucker Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Daniel P Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?