Contego Spa Designs Incorporated v. Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC et al
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs Incorporated
Defendant: Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC and Hang Thi Nhu Thach an individual doing business as NailGanic Scottsdale
Cross Claimant: Hang Thi Nhu Thach
Case Number: 2:2021cv01974
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC by Hang Thi Nhu Thach.(Eckert, Kimberly)
January 12, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC. (Smith, John)
January 12, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Party Organic Nails Spa by Vicky, LLC by Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant Hang Thach until January 14, 2022, to file an answer to the complaint in this matter (Doc. #17 ). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/11/22. (MAW)
January 11, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Stipulated by Hang Thi Nhu Thach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eckert, Kimberly)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Organic Nails Spa by Vicky, LLC shall have until January 14, 2022 to file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until January 21, 2022 to file an application for default against Defendant Hang Thi Nhu Thach. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/23/21. (MAW)
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE re: OF SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED ORDER by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Travis)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Status Report filed on December 17, 2021 (Doc. #12 ). IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff submit an Order to the Court for the requested extensions within 7 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/21/21. (MAW)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Report - Status filed by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Eric Fraser but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Travis Hunt. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 *STATUS REPORT by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. (Hunt, Travis) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 12/20/2021 (SST).
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: After review of the docket, the Court notes that service on Defendants was made on November 23, 2021. No answers have been filed and no applications for entry of default have been made. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice 7 days from the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/16/21. (MAW)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand upon Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC on 11/23/2021. (Hunt, Travis)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand upon Hang Thi Nhu Thach on 11/23/2021. (Hunt, Travis)
November 29, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Neal Matthew Cohen, James Kenechi Sakaguchi on behalf of Plaintiff Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. (Fraser, Eric)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. (Fraser, Eric)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC and Hang Thi Nhu Thach. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. (DLC)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(DLC)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20086560. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1974-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. (Fraser, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20086560 filed by Contego Spa Designs Incorporated. (Fraser, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contego Spa Designs Incorporated v. Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs Incorporated
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Travis Charles Hunt
Represented By: James Kenechi Sakaguchi
Represented By: Neal Matthew Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Nails Spa by Vicky LLC
Represented By: John Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hang Thi Nhu Thach an individual doing business as NailGanic Scottsdale
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Hang Thi Nhu Thach
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?