Brusalis v. OS Restaurant Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Brusalis
Defendant: OS Restaurant Services LLC and Bloomin' Brands Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv01980
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: John Z Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1980-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 21, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alanna Klein Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Brusalis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 14, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for William Hogg on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Brusalis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, OS Restaurant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Alexander Brusalis. (Grimsley, Matthew)
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Alexander Brusalis. (Grimsley, Matthew)
December 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew S Grimsley on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Brusalis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20087270. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1980-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20087270 filed by Alexander Brusalis. (Grimsley, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brusalis v. OS Restaurant Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Brusalis
Represented By: Alanna Klein Fischer
Represented By: Matthew S Grimsley
Represented By: William Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OS Restaurant Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?