Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Partners Personnel Management Services LLC
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Partners Personnel Management Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2021mc00011
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #5 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the Application for an Order to Show Cause (Doc. #1 ) as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Show Cause Hearing set for 5/20/2021. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 4/28/2021. (RMW)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Price, Benjamin)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (text only): On 3/19/2021, the Court ordered the EEOC to serve copies of specified documents on Partners Personnel Management Services LLC, or its attorney, by no later than 4/19/2021. (Doc. #3 .) To date, no affidavit of service has been filed. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the EEOC shall file a status report by no later than 12:00 PM on Friday, 4/30/2021, indicating whether service has been effectuated. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 4/27/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Respondent appear on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T Liburdi to show cause why it should not be compelled to comply with the subpoena issued.ORDERED that within 14 days of service of the copies of this Order and pleadings, Respondent shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on counsel for Petitioner a written response to the Application for Order to Show Cause and Memorandum in Support. Within seven (7) days of service of any written response filed by Respondents, Petitioner may file an optional reply. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 3/19/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi for ruling on the Motion to Show Cause why an Administrative Subpoena Should Not be Enforce. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-21-11-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 37(a) and 45(c)(2)(B) filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Price, Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Application for an Order to Show Cause Why an Administration Subpoena Should Not be Enforced, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Partners Personnel Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Mary Joleen O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin C Price
Represented By: James P Driscoll-MacEachron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Personnel Management Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?