SynKloud Technologies LLC et al v. Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated
Plaintiff: SynKloud Technologies LLC and Serendia LLC
Defendant: Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv00015
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and to File a Responsive Memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Stay by Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiddie, Robert)
March 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Anthony-Ray Sepulveda. (Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
February 23, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Declaration of Brian H. Gold, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
February 16, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Taniel E Anderson, Jasjit Vidwan, Brian Harris Gold, Richard LaCava on behalf of Defendant Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Defendant Aesthetics Biomedical, Inc.'s #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendant Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including 3/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/14/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Errata re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated.. (Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. (Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
February 9, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony-Ray Sepulveda on behalf of Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. (Sepulveda, Anthony-Ray)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE re: of Service by Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC re: #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Notice of Service of Order Dated January 5, 2022. (Poli, Michael)
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by SynKloud Technologies LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Aesthetics Biomedical, Inc. on January 21, 2022. (Poli, Michael)
January 21, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert Kiddie on behalf of Plaintiffs Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 21, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorneys Timothy Devlin and Robert Kiddie terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC. (Poli, Michael)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ideahub, Inc. for SynKloud Technologies LLC. (Poli, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/5/2022. (RMV)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC. (MYE)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20212783. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-15-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Serendia LLC, SynKloud Technologies LLC. (Poli, Michael) (MYE)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20212783 filed by SynKloud Technologies LLC, Serendia LLC. (Poli, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SynKloud Technologies LLC et al v. Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SynKloud Technologies LLC
Represented By: Michael N Poli
Represented By: Robert Kiddie
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Robert Kiddie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serendia LLC
Represented By: Michael N Poli
Represented By: Robert Kiddie
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Robert Kiddie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aesthetics Biomedical Incorporated
Represented By: Anthony-Ray Sepulveda
Represented By: Brian Harris Gold
Represented By: Jasjit Vidwan
Represented By: Richard LaCava
Represented By: Taniel E Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?