TD Professional Services v. Truyo Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: TD Professional Services
Defendant: Truyo Incorporated and Intraedge Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv00018
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED granting the Parties' Stipulation RE: Extension of Time for Defendants to File and Serve Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #16 ). The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to March 21, 2022. ORDERED by Judge Michael T. Liburdi this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
February 24, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint filed by Intraedge Incorporated, Truyo Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Hani Sayed but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Sarah Gilmartin. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
February 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven J Goon on behalf of Defendants Intraedge Incorporated, Truyo Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 23, 2022 Filing 16 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Intraedge Incorporated, Truyo Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilmartin, Sarah) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violations; attorney noticed on 2/24/2022 (SST).
February 23, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Sarah E Gilmartin on behalf of Defendants Intraedge Incorporated, Truyo Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TD Professional Services: Affidavit of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Order of Alternative Service; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Election Regarding Magistrate upon Truyo Incorporated; Intraedge Incorporated on 01/27/2022. (Entrekin, Barry)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Alternative Service. See Order for details of service. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall file an affidavit upon completion of service specifying the date and details on which alternative service has been accomplished. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/27/22. (SJF)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 EX PARTE MOTION Service by Alternative Means by TD Professional Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Entrekin, Barry)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/14/22. (SJF)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Michael T Liburdi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-0018-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by TD Professional Services. (Entrekin, Barry)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by TD Professional Services. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Intraedge Incorporated, Truyo Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20218673. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-18-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by TD Professional Services. (Entrekin, Barry) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD Professional Services. (Entrekin, Barry) (JAM)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20218673 filed by TD Professional Services. (Entrekin, Barry) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TD Professional Services v. Truyo Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TD Professional Services
Represented By: Barry Lance Entrekin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truyo Incorporated
Represented By: Hani Z Sayed
Represented By: Sarah E Gilmartin
Represented By: Steven J Goon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intraedge Incorporated
Represented By: Hani Z Sayed
Represented By: Sarah E Gilmartin
Represented By: Steven J Goon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?