Garcia v. Speedline AZ Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Enedina Garcia
Defendant: Speedline AZ Corporation, Mamoun Salah, Unknown Salah, Ayman Salah, Mohammad Adwan and Unknown Adwan
Case Number: 2:2022cv00103
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 3/31/2022 at 10:00 AM , in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. The parties must jointly file the Joint Proposed Case Management Report with the Clerk of the Court at least 10 days before the Scheduling Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 2/28/2022. (RMW)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedline AZ Corporation. (Myers, Tabitha)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mohammad Adwan, Ayman Salah, Mamoun Salah, Speedline AZ Corporation.(Myers, Tabitha) *Modified to remove filers not named in the document on 2/28/2022 (LAD).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/21/22. (SJF)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mohammad Adwan, Unknown Adwan, Ayman Salah, Mamoun Salah, Unknown Salah(Jane Doe Salah II, a married couple), Unknown Salah(Jane Doe Salah, a married couple), Speedline AZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20259929. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00103-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Enedina Garcia. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(BAC)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-20259929 filed by Enedina Garcia. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Speedline AZ Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enedina Garcia
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedline AZ Corporation
Represented By: Tabitha Rae Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamoun Salah
Represented By: Tabitha Rae Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Salah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayman Salah
Represented By: Tabitha Rae Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Adwan
Represented By: Tabitha Rae Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Adwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?