Rodriquez v. F-Squared Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jenna'v Rodriquez
Defendant: F-Squared Management LLC, John Flanders and Jeanine Flanders
Case Number: 2:2022cv00131
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #9 ), Civil Case Terminated with prejudice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
March 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jenna'v Rodriquez. (Barrat, Jason)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Notice of Service Pursuant to Dkt 5 by Jenna'v Rodriquez re: #5 Order, Set Deadlines . (Barrat, Jason)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jenna'v Rodriquez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon John Falnders on 22.01.31. (Barrat, Jason)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jenna'v Rodriquez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon F-Squared Management on 22.01.31. (Barrat, Jason)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 26, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/25/22. (MAW)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to F-Squared Management LLC, Jeanine Flanders, John Flanders. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20274273. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-131-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jenna'v Rodriquez. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20274273 filed by Jenna'v Rodriquez. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriquez v. F-Squared Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna'v Rodriquez
Represented By: Jason Saul Barrat
Represented By: Michael David Zoldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F-Squared Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanine Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?