Rojo v. Veraz Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yesenia Rojo
Defendant: Veraz Services LLC, Ricardo Velazquez and Unknown Velazquez
Case Number: 2:2022cv00144
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #7 , Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yesenia Rojo. (Bendau, Clifford)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 27, 2022. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/27/2022. (JAMA)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/27/2022. (JAMA)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ricardo Velazquez, Unknown Velazquez, Veraz Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20281232. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-144-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Yesenia Rojo. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20281232 filed by Yesenia Rojo. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojo v. Veraz Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Rojo
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veraz Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?