Atlas Packs LLC v. Nomatic Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Atlas Packs LLC
Defendant: Nomatic Incorporated, Nomatic Holdings LLC and Peter McKinnon
Case Number: 2:2022cv00173
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the Stipulation #17 . The above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions and stipulations #16 are deemed moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/28/2022. (REK)
March 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Atlas Packs LLC. (Rogal, Laura)
March 25, 2022 Filing 16 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Nomatic Holdings LLC, Nomatic Incorporated, Peter McKinnon. (Ward, Emily) *Modified to add additional filer on 3/28/2022. (SMH)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Doc. #14 ) and extending the due date for Defendants to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) to March 25, 2022. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/9/2022. (JAMA)
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Peter McKinnon, Nomatic Holdings LLC, Nomatic Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Emily)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Atlas Packs LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Peter McKinnon on 02/24/2022. (Rogal, Laura)
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Atlas Packs LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Nomatic Holdings, LLC on 2/15/2022. (Rogal, Laura)
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Atlas Packs LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Nomatic, Inc. on 2/15/2022. (Rogal, Laura)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlas Packs LLC. (Rogal, Laura)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Atlas Packs LLC. (Rogal, Laura)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/1/2022. (JAMA)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 3, 2022. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/1/2022. (JAMA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Atlas Packs LLC. (BAC)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(BAC)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Peter McKinnon, Nomatic Holdings LLC, Nomatic Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20299861. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00173-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Atlas Packs LLC. (Rogal, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-20299861 filed by Atlas Packs LLC. (Rogal, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlas Packs LLC v. Nomatic Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Packs LLC
Represented By: Laura Allison Rogal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomatic Incorporated
Represented By: Emily Ayn Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomatic Holdings LLC
Represented By: Emily Ayn Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter McKinnon
Represented By: Emily Ayn Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?