McCabe v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tammi R McCabe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00192
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. Therefore, this case is reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes and is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles for all pretrial proceedings. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), the Magistrate Judge shall file a written report and recommendation for final disposition by the referring District Judge. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number CV-22-00192-PHX-DLR (CDB). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Cheung appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Cheung, Allison)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tammi R McCabe: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General and Civil Process Clerk on 2/22/22, SSA General Counsel on 2/18/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rohlfing, Lawrence) *Modified text on 2/24/2022 (DXD).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 2/18/22. (DXD)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 7, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lawrence David Rohlfing on behalf of Plaintiff Tammi R McCabe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, United States Attorney General, and United States Attorney. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20312327. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-192-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Tammi R McCabe. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) (MYE)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20312327 filed by Tammi R McCabe. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of interested parties)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCabe v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi R McCabe
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?