Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rafael Rivera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00204
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Filing 15 *STATUS REPORT by Rafael Rivera. (Brown, James) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violations; attorney noticed on 3/24/2022 (SST).
March 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Krystle McMullan appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McMullan, Krystle)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff shall file a status report within 14 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of its case against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate this matter on March 25, 2022 without further order of the Court, if Plaintiff fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/9/22. (MJF)
March 4, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 402.00 receipt number AAZDC-20412341. (Brown, James)
March 4, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James P Brown on behalf of Plaintiff Rafael Rivera. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff either pay the required filing fee, or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, within 14 days of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that, should Plaintiff fail to pay the filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis within the timeframe required by this order, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this matter. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/17/2022. (RMV)
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 02/10/2022 (CEI)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties must fully comply with the deadlines and procedures set forth herein. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/10/2022. (RMV)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE Re Transfer of 1:21-cv-06865 from the Northern District of Illinois to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-22-00204-PHX-DLR. (MAP)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-06865 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED to the District of Arizona, the electronic record. (jg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's memorandum in support of agreed motion to transfer venue #5 is granted. This case is transferred to the District of Arizona. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi to transfer case (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Souza, Abraham) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Abraham Judson Souza as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Souza, Abraham) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rafael Rivera by James P. Brown (Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rafael Rivera; (Brown, James) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
December 27, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]
December 27, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/9/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Rivera
Represented By: James P Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Abraham Judson Souza
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Krystle Shenelle McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?