Arizona, State of et al v. Walsh, et al
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Nebraska, State of, South Carolina, State of and Mark Brnovich
Defendant: Martin J Walsh, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division, Joseph R Biden and Jessica Looman
Case Number: 2:2022cv00213
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Joseph R Biden, Jessica Looman, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division, Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Wilson Freeman filed by Wilson Freeman. (Freeman, Wilson)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/15/2022. (RMV)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 11, 2022. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/15/2022. (RMV)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Related Case (Doc. 163 ). Plaintiffs have not demonstrated that the requested transfer is warranted. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 3/1/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-01568-MTL, 2:22-cv-00213-JJT) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Taisa M Goodnature on behalf of Joseph R Biden, Jessica Looman, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division, Martin J Walsh. (Goodnature, Taisa)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Sandberg on behalf of Joseph R Biden, Jessica Looman, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division, Martin J Walsh. (Sandberg, Justin)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re: (163 in 2:21-cv-01568-MTL, 163 in 2:21-cv-01568-MTL) MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by Joseph R Biden, Jessica Looman, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division, Martin J Walsh. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00213-JJT, 2:21-cv-01568-MTL) (Sandberg, Justin)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiffs Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew)
February 17, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas T Hydrick on behalf of Plaintiff South Carolina, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 17, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian Patrick Kane, Douglas A Werth on behalf of Plaintiff Idaho, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 15, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas M Fisher on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case be reassigned, by lot, to another District Court Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable John J. Tuchi, United States District Court Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-22-00213-PHX-JJT. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/10/22. (SMH)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich. **Doc. 162 in CV-21-01568-PHX-MTL is being re-docketed using the correct event for statistical purposes.** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contractor Minimum Wage Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-21-01568-PHX-MTL, CV-22-00213-PHX-SPL) (DXD)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Motion to Transfer Related Case by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ensign, Drew)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER - See the attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/9/2022. (RMW)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joseph R Biden, Jessica Looman, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division, Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20325845. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-213-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Nebraska, State of, South Carolina, State of. (Ensign, Drew) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20325845 filed by Mark Brnovich, Indiana, State of, Idaho, State of, Arizona, State of, Nebraska, State of, South Carolina, State of. (Ensign, Drew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona, State of et al v. Walsh, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Wilson Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho, State of
Represented By: Brian Kane
Represented By: Brian Patrick Kane
Represented By: Douglas A Werth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Represented By: Thomas M Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Represented By: James A Campbell
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: Thomas T Hydrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Represented By: Wilson Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Taisa M Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Taisa M Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor, Wage & Hour Division
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Taisa M Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Biden
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Taisa M Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Looman
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Taisa M Goodnature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?