Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Charles Wesley Clark, III
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00256
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charles Wesley Clark, III: Notice of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (3/30/2022); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (3/24/2022); Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney for the District of Arizona (3/24/2022) on 3/30/2022; 3/24/2022; 3/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fern, Sarah)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 7, 2022 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Priddy appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Priddy, David)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen(15) days after service of Defendant's brief. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/17/2022. (LAD)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(LAD) (3 total)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis (doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/17/2022. (LAD)
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00256-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Charles Wesley Clark, III. (Fern, Sarah) (SCA)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Wesley Clark, III. (Fern, Sarah) (SCA)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charles Wesley Clark, III. (Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wesley Clark, III
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: David Priddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?