Capple v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Curtis Capple
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00269
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2022 Filing 15 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michonne Omo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Omo, Michonne)
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Curtis Capple. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Herrera, Betty)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Curtis Capple. Summons submitted for non-parties to case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit summonses for U.S. Attorney's Office Arizona and U.S. Attorney General. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. #3 ) and Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #3 -1). FURTHER ORDERED that: The parties must fully comply with LRCiv 16.1 in its entirety as follows (see order for complete details). Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order within fifteen (15) days of any appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 2/22/22. (NKS)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 22, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Betty Herrera on behalf of Plaintiff Curtis Capple. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-269-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Curtis Capple. (Herrera, Betty) (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(MYE)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Curtis Capple. (Herrera, Betty) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Curtis Capple. (Herrera, Betty) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capple v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Capple
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michonne Louise Omo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?