Schawl v. Oregano's Pizza Bistro Incorporated
Plaintiff: Brent Schawl
Defendant: Oregano's Pizza Bistro Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv00285
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Brent Schawl. (Mazaheri, Bernard) *Modified to correct document link and text on 2/28/2022 (REK).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/24/2022. (ESG)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/24/2022. (ESG)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/24/2022. (ESG)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Brent Schawl. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile automated Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Oregano's Pizza Bistro Incorporated. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20374241. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-285-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Brent Schawl. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (ARC)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20374241 filed by Brent Schawl. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schawl v. Oregano's Pizza Bistro Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Schawl
Represented By: Bernard R Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregano's Pizza Bistro Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?