Fidler v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Fidler
Defendant: Arizona, State of, Arizona Department of Child Safety, Lisa Burns, Unknown Burns, Melinda Quigley, Unknown Quigley, Marisol Manjarrez, Unknown Manjarrez, Kimmesha Edwards, Unknown Edwards, Francisco Sanez, III, Unknown Sanez, Unknown Adams, Bryan Adams, Michael Faust, Unknown Party, Amber Lamonte, Unknown Lamonte, Drue Kaplan- Siekman, Unknown Siekman, Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated, Bo Borch-Christensen, Unknown Borch-Christensen, Kathryn Coffman, Unknown Coffman, Jason Treguboff, Leigh Ann Treguboff and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2022cv00300
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Jessica Fidler Second. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- SAC Track Changes)(Connelly, Thomas)
April 22, 2022 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants filed by Jessica Fidler.(Connelly, Thomas)
April 22, 2022 Filing 44 STIPULATION re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion, STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR MOVING DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS [DOC 40] (First Request) by Bryan Adams, Lisa Burns, Kimmesha Edwards, Michael Faust, Marisol Manjarrez, Melinda Quigley, Francisco Sanez, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Julie)
April 22, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bo Borch-Christensen, Unknown Borch-Christensen, Kathryn Coffman, Unknown Coffman, Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated. (Goodhand, Sydney)
April 20, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE re: Service of Subpoena by Jessica Fidler . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connelly, Thomas)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Second Stipulation To Extend Answer Deadline For Drue Kaplan-Siekman (Doc. #39 ) is granted. Defendant Drue Kaplan-Siekman may file his answer or otherwise respond by April 25, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/19/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 18, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts 9-11 MOVING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF JESSICA FIDLERS STATE LAW CLAIMS IN PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 9-11 WITH PREJUDICE filed by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Connelly, Thomas)
April 18, 2022 Filing 39 *Second STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daussin, Sandra) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 4/18/2022 (LAD).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the third stipulation motion for extension of time (Doc. #35 ) is granted. Plaintiffs may file their Response or otherwise respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by today, April 18, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/18/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 18, 2022 Filing 37 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Amber Lamonte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartoszek, Gina)
April 18, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Marie Bartoszek on behalf of Amber Lamonte. (Bartoszek, Gina)
April 15, 2022 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts 9-11 MOVING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF JESSICA FIDLERS STATE LAW CLAIMS IN PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 9-11 WITH PREJUDICE by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connelly, Thomas)
April 15, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE re: Service of Subpoena by Jessica Fidler . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connelly, Thomas)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the motion to extend time for Defendants Phoenix Children's Hospital, Inc., Kathryn Coffman, M.D., John Doe Coffman, Bo Borch Christensen, M.D., and Jane Doe Borch-Christensen ("Defendants") to file their reply. (Doc. #32 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply by April 22, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/12/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 12, 2022 Filing 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bo Borch-Christensen, Unknown Borch-Christensen, Kathryn Coffman, Unknown Coffman, Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodhand, Sydney)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motion for extension of time (Doc. #30 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file her response to Defendants' motion to dismiss by April 15, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/6/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 5, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connelly, Thomas)
April 1, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jessica Fidler. (Connelly, Thomas)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation is granted. (Doc. #26 .) Plaintiff shall have until April 7, 2022, to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/24/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
March 24, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Sandra T Daussin. (Daussin, Sandra)
March 24, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of time to respond to Motion to Dismiss by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connelly, Thomas)
March 23, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kira Nicole Barrett on behalf of Drue Kaplan-Siekman. (Barrett, Kira)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline of Drue Kaplan-Siekman is granted. (Doc. #23 .) Defendant of Drue Kaplan-Siekman may file an Answer or responsive motion by April 18, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/23/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
March 23, 2022 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connelly, Thomas)
March 23, 2022 Filing 22 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Fidler: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Drue Kaplan-Siekman and signed by Defense Counsel on 3/23/2022. (Connelly, Thomas) *Modified to correct event and text on 3/24/2022 (REK).
March 23, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE re: Serving Subpoena by Jessica Fidler . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connelly, Thomas)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the parties' #19 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Response or otherwise respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is April 1, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W. Lanza. (ESG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry)
March 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Jessica Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connelly, Thomas)
March 18, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE re: of Service by Jessica Fidler . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connelly, Thomas)
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts 9-11 MOVING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF JESSICA FIDLERS STATE LAW CLAIMS IN PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT COUNTS 9-11 WITH PREJUDICE by Bryan Adams, Arizona, State of, Lisa Burns, Kimmesha Edwards, Michael Faust, Marisol Manjarrez, Melinda Quigley, Francisco Sanez, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Burns, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Quigley, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Manjarrez, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Edwards, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Saenz, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Adams, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Defendant Ewy & Policies)(Watson, Timothy)
March 9, 2022 Filing 16 *NOTICE re: Service of #15 Preliminary Order by Plaintiff Jessica Fidler. (Connelly, Thomas) *Modified text on 3/10/2022 (REK).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. T hat Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on May 26, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/8/22. (MAW)
March 8, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-300-PHX-DWL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 7, 2022 Filing 13 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bo Borch-Christensen, Unknown Borch-Christensen, Kathryn Coffman, Unknown Coffman, Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated. (Tamm, Michael)
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated for Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated. (Tamm, Michael)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT of Expert Testimony Required by Defendants Bo Borch-Christensen, Unknown Borch-Christensen, Kathryn Coffman, Unknown Coffman, Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated. (Tamm, Michael)
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bo Borch-Christensen, Unknown Borch-Christensen, Kathryn Coffman, Unknown Coffman, Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated.(Tamm, Michael)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 STATE DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bryan Adams, Arizona, State of, Lisa Burns, Kimmesha Edwards, Michael Faust, Marisol Manjarrez, Melinda Quigley, Francisco Sanez, III.(Watson, Timothy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Treguboff, Leigh Ann Treguboff.(Hyland, Timothy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Bryan Adams, Arizona, State of, Kimmesha Edwards, Michael Faust, Melinda Quigley, Francisco Sanez, III . (Watson, Timothy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE re: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILINGS DOCKETED AFTER REMOVAL by Bryan Adams, Arizona, State of, Kimmesha Edwards, Michael Faust, Melinda Quigley, Francisco Sanez, III re: #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Watson, Timothy)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE re: Consent to Removal by Jason Treguboff, Leigh Ann Treguboff . (Hyland, Timothy)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20383113. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-300-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-017147. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20383113 filed by Kimmesha Edwards, Melinda Quigley, Michael Faust, Bryan Adams, Francisco Sanez, III, Arizona, State of, Marisol Manjarrez, Lisa Burns. (Watson, Timothy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)
February 24, 2022 *STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Lisa Fisher, AZ Attorney General's Office authorized to accept for the State of Arizona on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Michael Faust on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Jane Doe Faust on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Bryan Adams on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Jane Doe Adams on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for AZ Department of Child Safety on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Marisol Manjarrez on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for John Doe Manjarrez on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Lisa Burns on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for John Doe Burns on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Kimmesha Edwards on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for John Doe Edwards on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Francisco Sanez, III on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Jane Doe Sanez on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Amber Lamonte on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for John Doe Lamonte on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Melinda Quigley on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for John Doe Quigley on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Haylie Damron, Agent authorized to accept on behalf of Bo Borch-Christensen on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Haylie Damron, Agent authorized to accept on behalf of Jane Doe Christensen on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Haylie Damron, Agent authorized to accept on behalf of Kathryn Coffman on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Haylie Damron, Agent authorized to accept on behalf of John Doe Coffman on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Scott Whaley, CT Corporation System authorized to accept for Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Jane Does 1-5 on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Yessica Arvizu, AZ Department of Child Safety authorized to accept for Black Entities 1-5 on 1/25/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 1/27/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Jason Treguboff on 2/1/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/2/2022) SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons/Amended Complaint/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Jason Treguboff accept for Leigh Ann Treguboff on 2/1/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/2/2022) (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidler v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Fidler
Represented By: DeeAn Gillespie Strub
Represented By: Kristina Beth Reeves
Represented By: Robert T Mills
Represented By: Sean Anthony Woods
Represented By: Thomas A Connelly
Represented By: Sandra T Daussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Child Safety
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Burns
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Quigley
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisol Manjarrez
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manjarrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimmesha Edwards
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Sanez, III
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Adams
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Faust
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Timothy J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Lamonte
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Represented By: Gina Marie Bartoszek
Represented By: Mitchell John Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lamonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drue Kaplan- Siekman
Represented By: Kira Nicole Barrett
Represented By: Mary Margaret Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Siekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Children's Hospital Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Freeman Tamm
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Sydney Darci Goodhand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Borch-Christensen
Represented By: Michael Freeman Tamm
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Sydney Darci Goodhand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Borch-Christensen
Represented By: Michael Freeman Tamm
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Sydney Darci Goodhand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Coffman
Represented By: Michael Freeman Tamm
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Sydney Darci Goodhand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Coffman
Represented By: Michael Freeman Tamm
Represented By: Vincent John Montell
Represented By: Sydney Darci Goodhand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Treguboff
Represented By: Timothy R Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Ann Treguboff
Represented By: Timothy R Hyland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?