Braun v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sandy C Braun
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00305
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's unopposed motion for extension (Doc. #8 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant may file its answer by July 1, 2022. ORDERED by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/14/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Omo, Michonne)
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michonne Omo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Omo, Michonne)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sandy C Braun: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorney General on 3/07/2022, U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona on 3/03/2022 Commissioner, and Social Security Administration via Office of General Counsel on 03/03/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service upon Attorney General, #2 Exhibit Service upon U.S. Attorney, #3 Exhibit Service upon Office of General Counsel)(Schiffman, Anna) *Modified to include all entities served on 3/22/2022 (REK).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/28/22. (MAW)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney, and US Attorney General., (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20386898. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-305-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Sandy C Braun. (Schiffman, Anna) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20386898 filed by Sandy C Braun. (Schiffman, Anna) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy C Braun
Represented By: Alan M Schiffman
Represented By: Anna Tucker Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michonne Louise Omo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?