Moreno v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Israel Moreno
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00319
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Israel Moreno: Notice of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (4/11/2022); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (4/7/2022); Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney for the District of Arizona (4/7/2022) on 4/11/2022; 4/7/2022; 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fern, Sarah)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sathya Oum appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Oum, Sathya)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties must fully comply with the deadlines and procedures set forth herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/1/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's #2 application to proceed without prepaying fees and costs is granted. Plaintiff is responsible for serving the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/1/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00319-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Israel Moreno. (Fern, Sarah) (SCA)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Israel Moreno. (Fern, Sarah) (SCA)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Israel Moreno. (Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Moreno
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?