Lallande v. Maricopa County Board of Supervisors et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, Cara Christ, Vincent Gales and Paul Penzone
Case Number: 2:2022cv00516
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff's April 29, 2022 #10 Motion for Leave to Change Parties is denied. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/9/2022. (ESG)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct (Titled: Motion for Leave to Change Parties) #1 Complaint by Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. (3 Pages) (REK)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed April 25, 2022, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed for failure to state a claim. This dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (REK)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/25/2022. (REK)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 is granted. The Complaint #1 is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1), and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), has considered whether an appeal of this decision would be taken in good faith and certifies that an appeal would not be taken in good faith for the reasons stated in the Order and because there is no arguable factual or legal basis for an appeal. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/25/2022. (REK)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. (1 page) (WLP)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. (3 pages) (WLP)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/06/2022. (ESG)
March 31, 2022 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. (1 page) (WLP)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (LAD)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. (LAD) (3 pages)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAD) (10 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lallande v. Maricopa County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Joseph Lallande, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Gales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?