Centner et al v. TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Gina Centner and Paul Paradis
Defendant: TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated and Mario Bauer
Case Number: 2:2022cv00886
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Alan Meda re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Gina Centner, Paul Paradis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Meda, Alan)
July 21, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Plaintiffs From Sending "Preservation Letters" to Third Parties, #13 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Plaintiffs From Sending "Preservation Letters" to Third Parties filed by Gina Centner, Paul Paradis. (Meda, Alan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion #14 . FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs Centner and Paradis shall have until July 21, 2022, to file a responsive pleading to Defendants' Motion for Order Precluding Plaintiffs from Sending Preservation Letters to Third Parties. Defendants' reply will be due July 27, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/15/2022. (KFZ)
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Plaintiffs From Sending "Preservation Letters" to Third Parties, #10 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Plaintiffs From Sending "Preservation Letters" to Third Parties by Mario Bauer, TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, Kristy)
July 14, 2022 Filing 13 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Plaintiffs From Sending "Preservation Letters" to Third Parties by Mario Bauer, TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Peters, Kristy)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Counsel for Plaintiffs. FURTHER ORDERED substituting Alan A. Meda with the law firm Burch & Cracchioloa PA in the place of Erik W. Center with the law firm Law Office of Erik W. Center retroactively effective as of 7/6/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 7/13/2022. (RMW)
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 EX PARTE MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gina Centner, Paul Paradis. (Meda, Alan)
July 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Plaintiffs From Sending "Preservation Letters" to Third Parties by Mario Bauer, TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Peters, Kristy)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #8 Notice of Appearance: Pursuant to LRCiv 83.3(b), IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to reinstate Eric W. Center as counsel for Plaintiffs. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 7/6/2022. (RMW)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Alan A. Meda appearing for Gina Centner, Paul Paradis. Attorney Erik W Centner terminated. . (Meda, Alan)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court consulted with the parties this morning telephonically. Defendant is authorized by Monday to file a motion for a protective order seeking protection from what it alleges to be excessive and abusive preservation letters to third parties. Plaintiff shall have a week in which to respond, and Defendant shall then have four business days in which to file a Reply.. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on July 6, 2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting a Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2022 at 1:00 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Plaintiffs' counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/6/2022. (KFZ)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Mario Bauer, TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated.(Peters, Kristy)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/24/2022. (KFZ)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20691677. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00886-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated. (Peters, Kristy) (SCA)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-051320. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20691677 filed by Mario Bauer, TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated. (Peters, Kristy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centner et al v. TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Centner
Represented By: Erik W Centner
Represented By: Alan A Meda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Paradis
Represented By: Erik W Centner
Represented By: Alan A Meda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMG Utility Advisory Services Incorporated
Represented By: Ian Christopher Beck
Represented By: Kristy Leah Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Bauer
Represented By: Ian Christopher Beck
Represented By: Kristy Leah Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?