Entertainment USA Incorporated v. Baldinsky
Plaintiff: Entertainment USA Incorporated a Delaware Corporation doing business as Christies Cabaret
Defendant: Tadeusz Baldinsky
Case Number: 2:2022cv00970
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Entertainment USA Incorporated. (Fischbach, William)
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Filing Exhibits to Plaintiff's Complaint by Entertainment USA Incorporated re: #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NameSilo Subpoena Response, #2 Exhibit USPTO Documents)(Fischbach, William)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 2, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/6/22. (MAW)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tadeusz Baldinsky. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(SCA)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20734261. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00970-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Entertainment USA Incorporated. (Fischbach, William) (SCA)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entertainment USA Incorporated. (Fischbach, William (SCA)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20734261 filed by Entertainment USA Incorporated. (Fischbach, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entertainment USA Incorporated v. Baldinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entertainment USA Incorporated a Delaware Corporation doing business as Christies Cabaret
Represented By: William Morris Fischbach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tadeusz Baldinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?