Ottley et al v. Arizona Game and Fish Commission et al
Plaintiff: John Randall Ottley, Anthony Covell and Dr. James Virgil Harvey
Defendant: Arizona Game and Fish Commission and Tyler Raspillar
Case Number: 2:2022cv01087
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
2 Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 *Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony Covell. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward. Document number #5 . (LAD) *Modified to correct document number from 8 to 5 on 7/27/2022 (LAD).
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Arizona Game and Fish Commission, Tyler Raspillar. (SMH)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs must either serve each Defendant in compliance with the applicable rules of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of this Court, or seek a waiver of service from each Defendant. If Plaintiffs do not obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine. If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Doc. #2 . See attached for complete information. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/19/22. (SMH)
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony Covell. Document numbers #3 , #4 . Note: reason for return was not reflected on envelope. (SMH)
June 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
June 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAS)
June 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Anthony Covell, James Virgil Harvey, and John Randall Ottley. (BAS)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX238602 filed by John Randall Ottley, James Virgil Harvey, Anthony Covell. (11 pages) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ottley et al v. Arizona Game and Fish Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Randall Ottley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Covell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. James Virgil Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Game and Fish Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Raspillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?