Montalbano v. Honor Health et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr.
Defendant: Laura Lee Martinez, Honor Health, Arizona Premier Surgery, Valley Anesthesiology Consultants Incorporated, Albert Amini, Unknown Amini, Amar Jitendra Thosani, Unknown Thosani, Daniel Parsons, Unknown Parsons, Maria Saldivar, Unknown Saldivar, Starr Elizabeth Eads, Unknown Eads, Kaitlin Makenzie Betcher, Unknown Betcher, Laura Lee Lu, Unknown Martinez, Hannah Robertson, Unknown Robertson, Stephanie Wogan, Unknown Wogan, Catherine Heitert, Unknown Heitert, Unknown Parties and CR Bard
Case Number: 2:2022cv01112
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION and Consent for Substitution of Counsel by Albert Amini. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Counsel)(Cullins, Douglas)
August 17, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Stay re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Memorandum of Po filed by Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr. (Moulton, Timothy)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the #20 Motion to Stay is granted. The filing of the Joint Case Management Report is stayed pending outcome of the Motion to Remand, and the Case Management Conference set on August 22, 2022 is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/15/2022. (ESG)
August 15, 2022 Filing 21 Joinder re: #20 MOTION to Stay Requirement to File Joint Case Management Order and Vacate Case Management Conference on August 22, 2022 Joinder in Motion to Stay by Defendant Maria Saldivar. filed by Maria Saldivar. (Kline, Peter)
August 12, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Requirement to File Joint Case Management Order and Vacate Case Management Conference on August 22, 2022 by Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moulton, Timothy)
August 10, 2022 Filing 19 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #18 MOTION to Stay re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Memorandum of Po Proposed Order by Defendant CR Bard. (Wittenberg, Daniel)
August 10, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by CR Bard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration)(Wittenberg, Daniel)
August 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Opposition by Maria Saldivar re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Kline, Peter)
August 4, 2022 Filing 16 *NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Robert Cullins on behalf of Albert Amini, Arizona Premier Surgery. (Cullins, Douglas) *Modified to reflect correct event and to add additional filer; attorney noticed on 8/5/2022 (SST).
July 29, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE re: of Status of Case and Status of Service of Process by Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A)(Moulton, Timothy)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Pursuant to the order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Doc. #13 ), the conditional transfer order has been stayed. Therefore, the Motion for Remand (Doc. #8 ) is subject to this Court's review. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that a response to the motion is due no later than August 10, 2022 and a reply due no later than August 17, 2022. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Brnovich. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REINSTATING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - that the stay of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order designated as "CTO-94" filed on July 12, 2022, is REINSTATED insofar as it relates to this action. (MAP)
July 22, 2022 Remark: Case NOT transferred to the Southern District of Ohio, case reopened pursuant to doc. #13 . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-94) Transferring Case to the Southern District of Ohio Re MDL-2846. (MAP)
July 22, 2022 Remark: Case Transferred to the Southern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Consent by Maria Saldivar re: #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kline, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Consent by Maria Saldivar re: #1 Notice of Removal, . (Kline, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Maria Saldivar . (Kline, Peter)
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Moulton, Timothy)
July 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr . (Moulton, Timothy)
July 12, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel S Wittenberg on behalf of Defendant CR Bard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for August 22, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/6/2022. (ESG)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/6/2022. (ESG)
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20829265. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1112-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by CR Bard. (Wiberg, Ashley) (ARC)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CR Bard. (Wiberg, Ashley) (ARC)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-002736. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20829265 filed by CR Bard. (Wiberg, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(ARC)
June 30, 2022 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Valley Anesthesiology Consultants Incorporated on 6/2/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/8/2022); upon Starr Elizabeth Eads on 6/21/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/27/2022); upon Honor Health on 6/2/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/8/2022).(ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montalbano v. Honor Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lee Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honor Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Premier Surgery
Represented By: Douglas Robert Cullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Anesthesiology Consultants Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Amini
Represented By: Douglas Robert Cullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amar Jitendra Thosani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thosani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Saldivar
Represented By: Peter G Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Saldivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Elizabeth Eads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Eads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlin Makenzie Betcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Betcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lee Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Wogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Heitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard
Represented By: Ashley N Wiberg
Represented By: Daniel S Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Joseph Montalbano, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Lee Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?