Bradley v. Bradley
Plaintiff: Scott Thomas Bradley
Defendant: Lori Lynn Bradley
Case Number: 2:2022cv01138
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/28/22. (SST)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/26/2022. (RMV)
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-1138-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff's "Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing without an Attorney and Supporting Information". Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 7/25/2022. (RMW)
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (WLP)
July 7, 2022 Filing 7 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX238879. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1138-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(WLP) *Modified to correct receipt number on 7/8/2022 (WLP).
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued over the counter to Plaintiff as to Lori Lynn Bradley. (WLP)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Scott Thomas Bradley. (WLP)
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Scott Thomas Bradley. (WLP)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Scott Thomas Bradley. (WLP)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Scott Thomas Bradley. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (WLP)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX238879 filed by Scott Thomas Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Thomas Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?