Fenty v. Penzone et al
Plaintiff: Jason Phillip Fenty
Defendant: Paul Penzone, Unknown Party, Maricopa, County of and Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 2:2022cv01183
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: John Z Boyle
2 Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The reference to Magistrate Judge Boyle is withdrawn only with respect to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration on Count Four (Doc. #8 ). All other matters in this action remain with Magistrate Judge Boyle for disposition as appropriate. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration on Count Four (Doc. #8 ) is denied. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/29/22. (SST)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion (doc. #7 ) is granted. Plaintiff's deadline to return service packets, as set forth in the Court's August 5, 2022 Order (doc. #5 ), is extended through September 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/19/22. (SST)
August 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration on Count Four re: #5 Order (Service Packet) by Jason Phillip Fenty. (SST) (2 pages)
August 15, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Return Service Packet by Jason Phillip Fenty. (SST) (2 pages)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE - Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jason Phillip Fenty. See attached for complete information. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/5/22. (SMH)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $14.26. Counts Four and Five are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Doe, Maricopa County, and Maricopa County Board of Supervisors are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Penzone must answer Counts One through Three. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Penzone. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); LRCiv 16.2(b)(2)(B)(ii). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle. See attached for complete information. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/5/22. (SMH)
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Phillip Fenty. (9 Pages) (REK)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Phillip Fenty. (2 Pages) (REK)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jason Phillip Fenty. (14 Pages and Envelope) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenty v. Penzone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Phillip Fenty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?