Rothenberger v. RevSpring Incorporated
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rothenberger
Defendant: RevSpring Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv01243
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court having received notice that this case has settled (Doc. #8 ), IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, DISMISS this entire case on November 14, 2022, and shall enter judgment accordingly, unless prior thereto a party files a request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines and hearings are vacated and that all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/12/22. (MAW)
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Rebecca Rothenberger. (Enoch, Nicholas)
August 5, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RevSpring Incorporated. (Leonhardt, Kristina)
August 3, 2022 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Morgan L. Bigelow. (Enoch, Nicholas)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #5 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to September 16, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/29/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Notice of Removal, by RevSpring Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leonhardt, Kristina)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/26/22. (MAW)
July 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to RevSpring Incorporated. (MYE)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20908565. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1243-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-006639. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20908565 filed by RevSpring Incorporated. (Uppal, Pavneet) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-9)(MYE)
July 22, 2022 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Demand for Jury Trial upon RevSpring Inc. on 6/24/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/1/2022.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothenberger v. RevSpring Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rothenberger
Represented By: Clara Stephanie Acosta
Represented By: Morgan Lee Bigelow
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RevSpring Incorporated
Represented By: Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?