Winters v. Industrial Commission of Arizona et al
Plaintiff: Tanya Winters
Defendant: Industrial Commission of Arizona and Mark Brnovich
Case Number: 2:2022cv01375
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #6 Order, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #5 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed with leave to file an amended complaint by September 22, 2022. The amended complaint must adhere to LRCiv 7.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by September 22, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate the action without further notice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/22/22. (MAW)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tanya Winters. (BAS)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER RE: Filing fee or IFP form. If Plaintiff fails to submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. See attached document for further details. (BAS)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01375-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tanya Winters. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 exhibits, #3 exhibits)(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Industrial Commission of Arizona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Commission of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?