Chacon v. Yuma Regional Medical Center
Plaintiff: Charles Chacon
Defendant: Yuma Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2022cv01392
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting 23 and 28 Motions to Consolidate Cases in case 2:22-cv-01061-SMB. Case No. 2:22-cv-01223-CDB and Case No. 2:22-cv-01392-SRB shall be consolidated for all purposes with CV22-01061-PHX-SMB. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed under Case No. CV22-01061-PHX-SMB. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/29/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01061-SMB, 2:22-cv-01223-DJH, 2:22-cv-01392-SRB, 2:22-cv-01411-DWL) (CLM)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-1392-PHX-SRB,CV-22-1061-PHX-SMB) (Buckley, Michelle)
September 9, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorney Lirit A King terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 7, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charles Chacon: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 9/07/2022 to Sarah A. Ballard . (Grombacher, Kiley)
August 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Marcus Bradley on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Chacon. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kiley L Grombacher on behalf of Plaintiff Charles Chacon. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 18, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Yuma Regional Medical Center. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21002160. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01392-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Charles Chacon. (Combs, C) (BAC)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21002160 filed by Charles Chacon. (Combs, C) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chacon v. Yuma Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Chacon
Represented By: Kiley L Grombacher
Represented By: Lirit A King
Represented By: Marcus J Bradley
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Represented By: Marcus Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuma Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?