Knox v. PracticeMax Incorporated
Plaintiff: Justin Knox
Defendant: PracticeMax Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv01455
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the motion to consolidate (Doc. 15 in CV-22-01261-PHX-DLR) is GRANTED. Cases CV-22-1286-PHX-DJH, CV-22-1387-PHX-ROS, and CV-22-1455-PHX-SPL shall be consolidated under the earlier-filed cause number, CV-22-01261-PHX-DLR, pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure. All future filings shall be made under the lead case number CV-22-01261-PHX-DLR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting the following deadlines: 1. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint within 20 days of this Order. 2. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint within 30 days of the Consolidated Complaint's filing. 3. Plaintiffs shall have 30 days to respond to any motion Defendant may file. 4. Defendant shall have 15 days to file a reply in support of any motion it may file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate case nos. CV-22-1286-PHX-DJH, CV-22-1387-PHX-ROS, and CV-22-1455-PHX-SPL. All deadlines in these terminates cases shall be vacated, and any pending motion or stipulation shall be terminated as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/11/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01261-DLR, 2:22-cv-01286-DJH, 2:22-cv-01387-ROS, 2:22-cv-01455-SPL) (WLP)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Stipulated Motion (Doc. #10 ) is granted. Defendant shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on Plaintiff's Motion for Consolidation (Doc. #9 ) in the first-filed action, Medina v. PracticeMax, No. 2:22-cv-01261-DLR, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/7/2022. (RMW)
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (Second Request) by PracticeMax Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Honecker, Kathryn)
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Doreen Barbieri, Flor Medina. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES) (Associated Cases: CV-01261-PHX-DLR, CV-01286-PHX-DJH, CV-01387-PHX-ROS, CV-01455-PHX-SPL) (Ryan, Elaine)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : PracticeMax Incorporated answer due 10/20/2022. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/21/22. (MJW)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by PracticeMax Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Honecker, Kathryn)
September 7, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Amanda Brooke Murphy, William B Federman on behalf of Plaintiff Justin Knox. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Justin Knox: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint and Preliminary Order upon PracticeMax on 08/30/2022. (Hesano, Cristina)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than September 28, 2022. FURTHER ORDERED that unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 28, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/29/22. (MJW)
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PracticeMax Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21042359. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1455-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Justin Knox. (Hesano, Cristina) (MCO)
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21042359 filed by Justin Knox. (Hesano, Cristina) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. PracticeMax Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Knox
Represented By: Cristina Perez Hesano
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Amanda Brooke Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PracticeMax Incorporated
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?