Sasser v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Shelly Sasser
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv01725
Filed: October 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Shelly Sasser. (BAS)
October 12, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gayle D Anthony on behalf of Plaintiff Shelly Sasser. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER Opening Brief due within 60 days after the answer is filed; Answering Brief due within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief; Reply Brief due within 15 days after service of Defendant's brief. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J. Humetewa on 10/11/2022. (ESG)
October 11, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Shelly Sasser. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order Consent for Magistrate)(Anthony, Gayle)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Shelly Sasser. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please re-file the Civil Cover Sheet, using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Shelly Sasser. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Shelly Sasser. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1): Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21188285. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01725-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
October 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21188285 filed by Shelly Sasser. (Anthony, Gayle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sasser v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Sasser
Represented By: Gayle D Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?