Ramirez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lidia Ramirez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv01929
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Ramirez: Notice of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (12/29/2022); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (12/27/2022); Gary M. Restaino, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (12/27/2022) on 12/29/2022; 12/27/2022; 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Larkin, Robin)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the #2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 12/20/2022. (ESG)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY: See order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 12/2/2022. (LMR)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01929-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Lidia Ramirez. (submitted by Robin Larkin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (REK)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lidia Ramirez. (submitted by Robin Larkin) (REK)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lidia Ramirez. (submitted by Robin Larkin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Ramirez
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?