Warren et al v. Penzone et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Warren and Robert Yates
Defendant: Paul Penzone, Maricopa, County of, Phoenix, City of, Nathan Bulldis, Gustavo Corrales, James Jessen, Alexander Kubes, Andrew Locascio, Airrion Moses, Isaac Perez, Danny Rubio and Michael Wood
Case Number: 2:2022cv02200
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: Camille D Bibles
2 Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that all Defendants have until March 17, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 2/03/2023. (REK)
February 3, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Struck on behalf of Nathan Bulldis, Airrion Moses, Isaac Perez. (Struck, Daniel)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The unopposed motion #16 is granted. Defendants Moses, Perez, and Bulldis shall have until March 17, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 2/03/2023. (REK)
February 3, 2023 Filing 23 Joinder re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Phoenix, City of. filed by Phoenix, City of. (Retts, Christina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Gail Retts on behalf of Phoenix, City of. (Retts, Christina)
February 3, 2023 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Nathan Bulldis on January 25, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
February 3, 2023 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Alexander Kubes on February 1, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
February 2, 2023 Filing 19 *MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer by Nathan Bulldis, Airrion Moses, Isaac Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Uglietta, Ann) *Modified to correct motion type and text on 2/3/2023 (REK).
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the stipulated motion #16 is granted. Defendants Maricopa County and Penzone shall have until February 17, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 2/01/2023. (REK)
February 1, 2023 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Isaac Perez on January 31, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 31, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Maricopa, County of, Paul Penzone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to Plead or Respond to Complaint)(Gottfried, Michael)
January 27, 2023 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Michael Wood on January 16, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 27, 2023 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Danny Rubio on January 16, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 26, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher M O'Neal on behalf of Plaintiff Diamond Warren. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 25, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by C Lincoln Combs on behalf of Robert Yates. (Combs, C)
January 24, 2023 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Andrew Locascio on January 23, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 24, 2023 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant James Jessen on January 23, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 24, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Gustavo Corrales on January 21, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Airrion Moses on January 21, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant City of Phoenix on January 11, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Maricopa County on January 11, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diamond Warren: Certificate of Service re: Complaint (Doc. 1); Notice of Assignment (Doc. 3); Order re Service (Doc. 4); and Summons (Doc. 5) upon Defendant Sheriff Paul Penzone on January 11, 2023. (Showalter, Jesse)
January 18, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorney Benjamin L Crump terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nathan Bulldis, Gustavo Corrales, James Jessen, Alexander Kubes, Andrew Locascio, Maricopa, County of, Airrion Moses, Paul Penzone, Isaac Perez, Phoenix, City of, Danny Rubio, Michael Wood. (Attachments: #1 Summons Maricopa County, #2 Summons City of Phoenix, #3 Summons Nathan Bulldis, #4 Summons Gustavo Corrales, #5 Summons James Jessen, #6 Summons Alexander Kubes, #7 Summons Andrew Locascio, #8 Summons Airrion Moses, #9 Summons Isaac Perez, #10 Summons Danny Rubio, #11 Summons Michael Wood) (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiffs must either serve each Defendant in compliance with the applicable rules of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of this Court, or seek a waiver of service from each Defendant. If Plaintiffs do not obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Doc. #2 . Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/09/2023. (REK)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (JAM)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Diamond Warren, Robert Yates. (Showalter, Jesse) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(JAM)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21450436 filed by Robert Yates, Diamond Warren. (Showalter, Jesse) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren et al v. Penzone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Warren
Represented By: Benjamin L Crump
Represented By: Jesse Morgan Showalter
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Represented By: Christopher M O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Yates
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Represented By: Kristin Marie Wrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: Charles E Trullinger
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Laura A Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Bulldis
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Represented By: Ashlee B Hesman
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Kubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Locascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airrion Moses
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Represented By: Ashlee B Hesman
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Perez
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Represented By: Ashlee B Hesman
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?