Mesa Public Schools v. Meta Platforms Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mesa Public Schools
Defendant: Meta Platforms Incorporated, Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Meta Payments Incorporated, Meta Platforms Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Siculus Incorporated, Snap Incorporated, TikTok Incorporated, ByteDance Incorporated, Alphabet Incorporated, Google LLC, XXVI Holdings Incorporated and YouTube LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00172
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in Northern District of California. New Case Number: 4:23-cv-00904. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 28, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-3047. (MAP)
February 28, 2023 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED allowing Defendants up to and including April 24, 2023 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/21/2023. (LFIG)
February 21, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Payments Incorporated, Meta Platforms Incorporated, Meta Platforms Technologies LLC, Siculus Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Meta Platforms Incorporated for Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Payments Incorporated, Meta Platforms Technologies LLC, Siculus Incorporated. (Samuels, Bruce)
February 21, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Payments Incorporated, Meta Platforms Incorporated, Meta Platforms Technologies LLC, Siculus Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Samuels, Bruce)
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Stephen M McNamee. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-23-00172-PHX-SMM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 8, 2023 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Public Schools: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge upon Alphabet Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube, LLC on 1/30/23. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service - Facebook Holdings, LLC, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service - Facebook Operations, LLC, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service - Instagram, LLC, #4 Attachment Certificate of Service - Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, #5 Attachment Certificate of Service - Meta Platforms, Inc., #6 Attachment Certificate of Service - Siculus, Inc., #7 Attachment Certificate of Service - XXVI Holdings Inc., #8 Attachment Certificate of Service - YouTube, LLC) (Kilgard, Ron)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mesa Public Schools: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Tiktok, Snap, Inc., Meta Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Bytedance, Inc. on 1-31-2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service - Snap, #2 Attachment Cert of Service - Meta, #3 Attachment Cert of Service - Google, #4 Attachment Cert of Service - Bytedance)(Kilgard, Ron)
February 3, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Chris Springer on behalf of Plaintiff Mesa Public Schools. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 3, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gretchen Freeman Cappio, Cari C Laufenberg, Derek W Loeser, Dean Kawamoto, Felicia J Craick, Garrett A Heilman, Christopher N Ryder on behalf of Plaintiff Mesa Public Schools. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 3, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lynn Sarko on behalf of Plaintiff Mesa Public Schools. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 27, 2023 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Corrected Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron)
January 27, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Incorporated, ByteDance Incorporated, Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Google LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Payments Incorporated, Meta Platforms Incorporated, Meta Platforms Technologies LLC, Siculus Incorporated, Snap Incorporated, TikTok Incorporated, XXVI Holdings Incorporated, YouTube LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Mesa Public Schools. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Mesa Public Schools. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21533554. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James F Metcalf. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-0172-PHX-JFM. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(MCO)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21533554 filed by Mesa Public Schools. (Kilgard, Ron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesa Public Schools v. Meta Platforms Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mesa Public Schools
Represented By: Dean Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W Loeser
Represented By: Felicia J Craick
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Cari C Laufenberg
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Joseph Chambers Tann
Represented By: Chris Springer
Represented By: Christopher N Ryder
Represented By: Lynn Sarko
Represented By: Garrett A Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Incorporated
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Holdings LLC
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Operations LLC
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Payments Incorporated
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Technologies LLC
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram LLC
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siculus Incorporated
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XXVI Holdings Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?