Avila v. JBL Cleaning Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Minerva Avila
Defendant: JBL Cleaning Services LLC, Bryan Barajas, Unknown Barajas and Jose Barajas
Case Number: 2:2023cv00398
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Unknown Barajas (named as Jane Doe Barajas II). (KJ)
May 2, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Minerva Avila against Jane Doe Barajas II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, declaration of Chris Bendau in support)(Bendau, Christopher)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jose Barajas, Unknown Barajas, JBL Cleaning Services LLC. (KJ)
April 25, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Minerva Avila against JBL Cleaning Services LLC and Jose Barajas and Jane Doe Barajas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Clifford P. Bendau, II)(Bendau, Clifford)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/14/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/4/2023. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 4, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Minerva Avila: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Jane Doe Barajas II on 3/9/23. (Bendau, Clifford)
April 4, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Minerva Avila: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Jose Barajas on 3/9/23. (Bendau, Clifford)
April 4, 2023 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Minerva Avila: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon JBL Cleaning Services LLC on 3/9/23. (Bendau, Clifford)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/9/2023. (LFIG)
March 8, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bryan Barajas, Jose Barajas, Unknown Barajas(named as Jane Doe Barajas II), Unknown Barajas(named as Jane Doe Barajas, a married couple), JBL Cleaning Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21674623. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-398-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
March 8, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Minerva Avila. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC)
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21674623 filed by Minerva Avila. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila v. JBL Cleaning Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Avila
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBL Cleaning Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?