JUUL Labs Incorporated et al v. NJOY LLC et al
Plaintiff: JUUL Labs Incorporated and VMR Products LLC
Defendant: NJOY LLC, NJOY Holdings Incorporated, Altria Group Incorporated, Altria Group Distribution Company and Altria Client Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01204
Filed: June 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER STAYING CASE: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay (Doc. #22 ) is granted and this action is stayed. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 60 days of this Order, every 60 days thereafter, and within 5 days of any final determination by the United States International Trade Commission ("ITC"). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/18/2023. (KJ)
August 16, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NJOY Holdings Incorporated. (Barker, David)
August 16, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NJOY LLC. (Barker, David)
August 15, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay by NJOY Holdings Incorporated, NJOY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Barker, David)
August 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David Gary Barker on behalf of NJOY Holdings Incorporated, NJOY LLC. (Barker, David)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation For Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until August 23, 2023, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/31/2023. (WLP)
August 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kaiyeu Kevin Chu on behalf of Plaintiff JUUL Labs Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kaiyeu Kevin Chu on behalf of Plaintiff VMR Products LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 25, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorney K Kevin Chu and Jonathan T Engler terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Victoria Maroulis on behalf of Plaintiffs JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 21, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Defendants' First Request) by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kunz, Nathan)
July 20, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael Renaud on behalf of Plaintiffs JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC re: #12 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (Kunz, Nathan)
July 17, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Scott Alex Lasher on behalf of Plaintiffs JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 14, 2023 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Stmt; AO Forms 85 and 120; Preliminary Order upon Altria Group, Inc. on 07/03/2023. (Kunz, Nathan)
July 14, 2023 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Stmt; AO Forms 85 and 120; Preliminary Order upon NJOY Holdings, Inc. on 07/03/2023. (Kunz, Nathan)
July 14, 2023 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Stmt; AO Forms 85 and 120; Preliminary Order upon Altria Client Services LLC on 07/03/2023. (Kunz, Nathan)
July 13, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kevin PB Johnson, Iman Lordgooei on behalf of Plaintiffs JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 12, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Andrew Holmes on behalf of Plaintiffs JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon NJOY, LLC c/o Capital Corporate Services, Inc. on 07/03/2023. (Kunz, Nathan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Altira Group Distribution Co., c./o Capital Corporation Services, Inc. on 07/03/2023. (Kunz, Nathan)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiffs must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk no later than 9/28/2023. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on 9/28/2023, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/5/2023. (KJ)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Dominic W Lanza recused. Case reassigned to Judge Steven P Logan for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-23-1204-PHX-SPL. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/3/2023. (KJ)
June 30, 2023 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. (Kunz, Nathan) *Modified link on 7/3/2023 (KJ).
June 30, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group Incorporated, NJOY Holdings Incorporated, NJOY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. (Kunz, Nathan) (MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22059811. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-1204-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VMR Products LLC. (Kunz, Nathan) (MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUUL Labs Incorporated. (Kunz, Nathan) (MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. (Kunz, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22059811 filed by JUUL Labs Incorporated, VMR Products LLC. (Kunz, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-2, #3 Exhibit 3-4, #4 Exhibit 5-9, #5 Exhibit 10)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUUL Labs Incorporated et al v. NJOY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUUL Labs Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew M Holmes
Represented By: Iman Lordgooei
Represented By: K Kevin Chu
Represented By: Kevin PB Johnson
Represented By: Malvika Sinha
Represented By: Michael T Renaud
Represented By: Nathan J Kunz
Represented By: Victoria F Maroulis
Represented By: Michael Renaud
Represented By: Andrew Holmes
Represented By: Kaiyeu Kevin Chu
Represented By: Scott Alex Lasher
Represented By: Victoria Maroulis
Represented By: Jonathan J Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VMR Products LLC
Represented By: Victoria F Maroulis
Represented By: Kevin PB Johnson
Represented By: Malvika Sinha
Represented By: Michael T Renaud
Represented By: Nathan J Kunz
Represented By: Andrew M Holmes
Represented By: Iman Lordgooei
Represented By: K Kevin Chu
Represented By: Andrew Holmes
Represented By: Michael Renaud
Represented By: Scott Alex Lasher
Represented By: Victoria Maroulis
Represented By: Jonathan J Engler
Represented By: Kaiyeu Kevin Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJOY LLC
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Represented By: Zachary Gerald Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJOY Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Zachary Gerald Schroeder
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?