Goodwin v. Unum Group et al
Plaintiff: Scott C Goodwin
Defendant: Unum Group and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01546
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Defendant Unum Group shall have until October 20, 2023 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/27/2023. (ESG)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bressler, Stephen)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Scott C Goodwin: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint; Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge upon Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company on 09/19/2023. (Dawson, Steven)
September 14, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Scott C Goodwin: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint; Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge upon Unum Group on 09/13/2023. (Dawson, Steven)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/2/2023. (ESG)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/2/2023. (ESG)
August 2, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22159286. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-1546-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
August 2, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Scott C Goodwin. (Dawson, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22159286 filed by Scott C Goodwin. (Dawson, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott C Goodwin
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dawson
Represented By: Alexandra Oriana Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Represented By: Steven C Dawson
Represented By: Alexandra Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?