Eli Lilly and Company v. Sensational Skin Centers PLLC
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Defendant: Sensational Skin Centers PLLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01970
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing - AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lento, Gary)
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Service of #10 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Eli Lilly and Company . (Lento, Gary)
October 30, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #11 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (CSL)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sensational Skin Centers PLLC. (Durrett, Hannah)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sensational Skin Centers PLLC.(Durrett, Hannah)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for December 14, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 605, Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/13/23. (REK)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Eli Lilly and Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint packet upon Sensational Skin Centers, PLLC on 09/30/2023. (Lento, Gary)
October 5, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bruce W Baber on behalf of Plaintiff Eli Lilly and Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
October 5, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorney Bruce W Baber terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or party represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 29, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph N Akrotirianakis on behalf of Plaintiff Eli Lilly and Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 26, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Aaron Samuel Bennett Craig on behalf of Plaintiff Eli Lilly and Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than December 17, 2023. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 18, 2023, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/20/23. (REK)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lento, Gary) (SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sensational Skin Centers PLLC. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22311865. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-01970-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lento, Gary) (SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lento, Gary) (SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22311865 filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lento, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli Lilly and Company v. Sensational Skin Centers PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Aaron Craig
Represented By: Bruce W Baber
Represented By: Gary N Lento
Represented By: Joseph N Akrotirianakis
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bennett Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensational Skin Centers PLLC
Represented By: Hannah Karen Durrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?