Handgis et al v State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: George Handgis and Sharon Handgis
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01971
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal - Breach of Contract - Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by George Handgis. (Levin, Mick)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Bell, David)
October 30, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Bell, David)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue filed by George Handgis. (Levin, Mick)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by George Handgis, Sharon Handgis. (Levin, Mick)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER discharging the Courts Order to Show Cause (Doc. #6 ) issued to Plaintiffs on October 3, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/12/2023. (WLP)
October 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Bell, David)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Discharged pursuant to #8 - ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs show cause no later than October 10, 2023, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, unless before then default has been entered or a responsive pleading has been filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiffs fail to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action on October 11, 2023, for Plaintiffs' lack of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., and LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/2/2023. (WLP) Modified on 10/13/2023 (WLP).
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Bell, David)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/19/2023. (WLP)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22309177. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-01971-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-012646. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22309177 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Bell, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handgis et al v State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Handgis
Represented By: Mick Levin
Represented By: Stewart Franklin Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Handgis
Represented By: Mick Levin
Represented By: Stewart Franklin Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David Martin Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?