Johnson et al v. Chandler Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Johnson and Latonia Johnson
Defendant: Chandler Unified School District, Yolanda Carreto Diaz, Dionicio Corte, Christopher Price, Sharrell D Price, Heather Michell Ramirez, Unknown Garcia, Chadrice Moore, Unknown Moore, Michael Franklin, Jr., Unknown Franklin, James Culver, Unknown Culver, Luke Hickey, Unknown Hickey, Richard Garretson, Unknown Garretson, Brett Boyd, Unknown Boyd, Frank Narducci, Unknown Narducci and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00530
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Frank Fox appearing for Dionicio Corte. . (Fox, Frank)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 5/9/2024. (LMR)
May 2, 2024 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Summons; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Jane Doe Franklin on 4/5/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
May 2, 2024 Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Summons; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Michael Franklin, Jr. on 4/5/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
May 2, 2024 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Summons; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Dionicio Corte on 4/5/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 26, 2024 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dionicio Corte. (8 Pages)(KLG)
April 26, 2024 Filing 23 *ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unknown Garcia, Heather Michell Ramirez. (1 Page)(KLG) *At the request of chambers, document sealed on 4/26/2024 (NKS).
April 19, 2024 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Jane Doe Hickey on 4/6/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 19, 2024 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Luke Hickey on 4/6/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Heather Michell Ramirez on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon I.G. on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Jane Doe Garretson on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Richard Garreston on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Jane Doe Culver on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon James Culver on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Sharrell D. Price on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Christopher Price on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon TP on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel)
April 17, 2024 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Jane Doe Boyd on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel) *Modified to correct text on 4/17/2024 (KLG).
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Brett Boyd on 4/13/2024. (Raynak, Daniel) *Modified to correct text on 4/17/2024 (KLG).
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeremy Johnson: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint; Civil Coversheet; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge upon Chandler Unified School District on 3/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment)(Raynak, Daniel) *Modified to correct text on 4/17/2024 (KLG).
March 29, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Michael T Liburdi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-00530-PHX-MTL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 22, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Jeremy Johnson, Latonia Johnson show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brett Boyd, Unknown Boyd, Chandler Unified School District, Dionicio Corte, James Culver, Unknown Culver, Yolanda Carreto Diaz, Michael Franklin, Jr, Unknown Franklin, Unknown Garcia, Richard Garretson, Unknown Garretson, Luke Hickey, Unknown Hickey, Chadrice Moore, Unknown Moore, Frank Narducci, Unknown Narducci, Christopher Price, Sharrell D Price, Heather Michell Ramirez. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Jeremy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)(Raynak, Daniel)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22840120. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00530-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22840120 filed by Jeremy Johnson, Latonia Johnson. (submitted by Daniel Raynak) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Chandler Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Robert Raynak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Robert Raynak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Carreto Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionicio Corte
Represented By: Frank Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharrell D Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Michell Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadrice Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Franklin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?