Scott v. United States Veterans Administration
Plaintiff: Gene Edward Scott, II
Defendant: United States Veterans Administration
Case Number: 2:2024cv00935
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying as moot the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. #7 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/15/2024. (JAMA)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 EX PARTE MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gene Edward Scott, II. (1 Page) (REK)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action in its entirety. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/03/2024. (REK)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION to Dismiss Case by Gene Edward Scott, II. (2 Pages) (REK)
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00935-PHX-SMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gene Edward Scott, II. (2 Pages) (REK)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 EX PARTE COMPLAINT filed by Gene Edward Scott, II. (5 Pages, Cover Sheet, and Envelope) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. United States Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Edward Scott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?