Begg v. New Life Wellness Arizona LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise Begg
Defendant: New Life Wellness Arizona LLC and Darcy Emert-Roybal
Case Number: 2:2024cv00990
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Denise Begg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Barrat, Jason)
June 6, 2024 Filing 10 *MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by Plaintiff Denise Begg against New Life Wellness Arizona, LLC and Darcy Emert-Roybal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct event type and text on 6/7/2024 (KLG).
June 5, 2024 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Darcy Emert-Roybal, New Life Wellness Arizona LLC. (KLG)
June 4, 2024 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Denise Begg against Defendants New Life Wellness Arizona, LLC, and Darcy Emert-Roybal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default)(Barrat, Jason)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Denise Begg: Proof of Service re: Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Summons upon New Life Wellness Arizona, LLC on May 13, 2024. (Barrat, Jason)
May 14, 2024 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Denise Begg: Proof of Service re: Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Summons upon Darcy Emert-Roybal on May 13, 2024. (Barrat, Jason)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/1/2024. (KLG)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Darcy Emert-Roybal, New Life Wellness Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23000174. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00990-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Denise Begg. (submitted by Jason Barrat) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK)
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23000174 filed by Denise Begg. (submitted by Jason Barrat) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Begg v. New Life Wellness Arizona LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Begg
Represented By: Jason Saul Barrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Life Wellness Arizona LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcy Emert-Roybal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?