Scott v. United States Veterans Administration
Plaintiff: Gene Edward Scott, II
Defendant: United States Veterans Administration
Case Number: 2:2024cv01043
Filed: May 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 On June 11, 2024, the Court granted Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of this action and closed this matter. (Doc. #11 ). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's July 1, 2024 "Ex Parte Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. #12 ) as moot. This matter shall remain closed. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 28, 2024 Filing 12 EX PARTE MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gene Edward Scott, II. (2 Pages) (REK)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (Docs. #5 , #10 ) are GRANTED. ORDERED that the Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/10/24. (EJA)
June 7, 2024 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION for Summary Judgment, for the Plaintiff, for Federal Rules of Civil Procedure but without Fault to Plaintiff by Gene Edward Scott, II. (EJA)
June 3, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-1043-PHX-DJH. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for June 17, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 3, 2024 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Gene Edward Scott, II show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gene Edward Scott, II. (2 pages) (EJA)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-01043-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(EJA)
May 7, 2024 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gene Edward Scott, II. (EJA)
May 7, 2024 Filing 1 EX PARTE COMPLAINT filed by Gene Edward Scott, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2024: #2 Envelope) (EJA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. United States Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Edward Scott, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?