HonorHealth v. Becerra
Plaintiff: HonorHealth
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 2:2024cv01837
Filed: July 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by HonorHealth: Declaration of Service re: Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction by Magistrate, Summons, and Disclosure Statement upon Xavier Becerra, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services on August 14, 2024. (Gere, Eric)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 24, 2024. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/7/2024. (JAMA)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/7/2024. (JAMA)
August 7, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-1837-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 7, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Martin W Jaszczuk, Margaret M Schuchardt, Catherine Lusk on behalf of Plaintiff HonorHealth. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 6, 2024 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2024 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by HonorHealth. (Gere, Eric)
July 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to HonorHealth. (DXD)
July 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra. (DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 25, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23287042. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-01837-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(DXD)
July 25, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by HonorHealth. (Gere, Eric) (DXD)
July 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23287042 filed by HonorHealth. (Gere, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HonorHealth v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HonorHealth
Represented By: Margaret M Schuchardt
Represented By: Eric Dell Gere
Represented By: Catherine Lusk
Represented By: Martin W Jaszczuk
Represented By: Martin W Jaszczuk
Represented By: Margaret M Schuchardt
Represented By: Catherine Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?