Saweiras v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Fayez Dallooa Saweiras
Defendant: David Radel, Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur Jaddou
Case Number: 2:2024cv02203
Filed: August 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2024 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #8 ), this civil case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alfred Fayez Dallooa Saweiras. (Goldman, Maurice)
September 14, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alfred Fayez Dallooa Saweiras: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Defendants on September 5, 2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Garland, #2 Affidavit Service Jaddou, #3 Affidavit Service Radel, #4 Affidavit Service Restaino)(Goldman, Maurice)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/28/24. (EJA)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 26, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/28/24. (EJA)
August 27, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, David Radel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DXD)
August 26, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23396096. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-02203-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
August 26, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Alfred Fayez Dallooa Saweiras. (Goldman, Maurice) (DXD)
August 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for WRIT OF MANDAMUS. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23396096 filed by Alfred Fayez Dallooa Saweiras. (Goldman, Maurice) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saweiras v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Radel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Fayez Dallooa Saweiras
Represented By: Maurice Henri Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?