Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club et al v. Bosworth et al
Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club and Maricopa Audubon Society
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Neil Bosworth, Jeffrey Humphreys, Debra Haaland and Thomas Vilsack
Case Number: 2:2024cv02348
Filed: September 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2024 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Neil Bosworth, United States Forest Service, Thomas Vilsack, Jeffrey Humphreys, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Debra Haaland, U.S. Attorney Gary Restaino and U.S Attorney General Merrick Garland on 9/14/24, 9/16/24, 9/17/24. (Delehanty, Thomas)
September 13, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Heidi J McIntosh on behalf of Plaintiffs Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 10, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas R Delehanty on behalf of Plaintiffs Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 10, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Roger Flynn on behalf of Plaintiffs Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic W Lanza for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-24-02348-PHX-DWL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/9/2024. (KJ)
September 6, 2024 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society. (Delehanty, Thomas)
September 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
September 6, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Neil Bosworth, Debra Haaland, Jeffrey Humphreys, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Thomas Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 5, 2024 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23429396. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-02348-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
September 5, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club, Maricopa Audubon Society. (submitted by Thomas Delehanty) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(REK)
September 5, 2024 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Maricopa Audubon Society. (submitted by Thomas Delehanty) (REK)
September 5, 2024 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club. (submitted by Thomas Delehanty) (REK)
September 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23429396 filed by Maricopa Audubon Society, Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club. (submitted by Thomas Delehanty) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club et al v. Bosworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Chapter of the Sierra Club
Represented By: Thomas R Delehanty
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Represented By: Thomas R Delehanty
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricopa Audubon Society
Represented By: Thomas R Delehanty
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Represented By: Thomas R Delehanty
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?