Saliba et al v. Federal Aviation Administrator
Plaintiff: Mark Charles Bashaw, Jeffery Chandler and Bahig Saliba
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administrator
Case Number: 2:2024cv02673
Filed: October 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Opposition to Extension by Bahig Saliba, Mark Charles Bashaw, Jeffery Chandler. (DXD)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Bahig Saliba. (EJA)
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Writ of Mandamus and Demand for Performance of Duty by Agency) against Federal Aviation Administrator filed by Bahig Saliba, Jeffery Chandler, Mark Charles Bashaw.(EJA)
October 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA)
October 7, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Mark Charles Bashaw, Jeffery Chandler, Bahig Saliba. (EJA)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/7/24. (MJW)
October 4, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 200013806. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-2673-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA)
October 4, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued at Customer Service Intake Counter as to Federal Aviation Administration on 10/04/2024. (HLA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 4, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted in person at Customer Service Counter by Mark Charles Bashaw, Jeffery Chandler, Bahig Saliba on 10/04/2024 (HLA)
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Writ of Mandamus and Demand for Performance of Duty by Agency). Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number 200013806 filed by Bahig Saliba, Jeffery Chandler, Mark Charles Bashaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HLA) Modified on 10/7/2024 (HLA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saliba et al v. Federal Aviation Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Charles Bashaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahig Saliba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?