Christman v. BE's Refreshments
Plaintiff: Richard R Christman
Defendant: BE's Refreshments
Case Number: 2:2024cv03189
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BE's Refreshments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gale, Jessica)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Christman. Reason for return: No such number. Document number #9 . (DXD)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Alternatively Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Richard R Christman. (Valletta, James)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss (First Request) (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file his Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #7 ) to December 13, 2024. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/4/2024. (JAMA)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Richard R Christman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Valletta, James)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Valletta on behalf of Richard R Christman. (Valletta, James)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Christman. Reason for return: No such number. Document number #5 and #6 . (DXD)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Christman. Reason for return: Not deliverable as addressed. Document number #3 and #4 . (DXD)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Motion to Dismiss and Alternatively Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. #7 ) no later than 12/5/24. See order for details. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 11/21/24. (NKS)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by BE's Refreshments re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Certificate of Conferral). (Gale, Jessica)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BE's Refreshments. (Gale, Jessica)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/18/2024. (REK)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on February 11, 2025. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/18/2024. (REK)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23669492. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-03189-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by BE's Refreshments. (submitted by Jessica Gale) (REK)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-022696. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23669492 filed by BE's Refreshments. (submitted by Jessica Gale) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christman v. BE's Refreshments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R Christman
Represented By: Yvonne Sandra Tindell
Represented By: James Valletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BE's Refreshments
Represented By: Seth Aaron Brimley
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?