Pepaj et al v. Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Gray, Eva Pepaj, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Toth, Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Rosa Acosta and Anya Monzikova Fritts
Defendant: Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Jimmie Dee's and Richard Good
Case Number: 2:2025cv00175
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Krissa M Lanham
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Eva Pepaj, Rosa Acosta, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Gray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Order)(Golaszewski, John)
March 18, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by Amy Wilkins Hoffman. (Hoffman, Amy)
February 20, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by John V Golaszewski. (Golaszewski, John)
February 20, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark, AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC, Richard Good. (Stone, Erik)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed within 4 weeks of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the parties shall file and email in Word format to Lanham_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov a proposed Case Management Order containing all the proposed dates at the same time they file the Rule 26(f) Case Management Report. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 2/20/2025. (NSH)
February 20, 2025 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #10 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (REK)
February 19, 2025 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC. (Stone, Erik)
February 19, 2025 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC, Richard Good.(Stone, Erik)
February 14, 2025 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Eva Pepaj, Rosa Acosta, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Gray: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Order upon Jimmie Dee's Bar c/o Richard Good on 01-29-2025. (Hoffman, Amy)
February 14, 2025 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Eva Pepaj, Rosa Acosta, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Gray: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order, Civil Cover Sheet upon Richard Good on 01-29-2025. (Hoffman, Amy)
January 30, 2025 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John V Golaszewski on behalf of Plaintiffs Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Eva Pepaj, Rosa Acosta, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Gray. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or TrademarkAO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Eva Pepaj, Rosa Acosta, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Gray. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Hoffman, Amy)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Both counsel and pro se litigants must abide by the Rules of Practice of the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona ("Local Rules") and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this order on defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court. FURTHER ORDERED that, unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 23, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any defendant in the United States that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 1/22/2025. (NSH)
January 22, 2025 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (REK)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Richard Good, Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number BAZDC-23886449. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Krissa M Lanham. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-25-00175-PHX-KML. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Irina Voronina, Claudia Sampedro, Kimberly Cozzens, Eva Pepaj, Rosa Acosta, Anya Monzikova Fritts, Janet Guzman, Tiffany Gray. (submitted by Amy Hoffman) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(REK)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number BAZDC-23886449 filed by Irina Voronina, Tiffany Gray, Kimberly Cozzens, Rosa Acosta, Claudia Sampedro, Eva Pepaj, Janet Guzman, Anya Monzikova Fritts. (submitted by Amy Hoffman) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepaj et al v. Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Gray
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Guzman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cozzens
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Acosta
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anya Monzikova Fritts
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Dee's Bar LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Jimmie Dee's
Represented By: Michael August Ludwig
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Good
Represented By: Michael August Ludwig
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?